IN SB0176 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Public Law 153
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the establishment or expansion of public transportation services other than light rail in an eligible county through a local public question placed on the ballot under an ordinance adopted by the fiscal body of the eligible county. Requires the department of local government finance to review and approve the language of a local public question. Provides that Delaware County, Hamilton County, Hancock County, Johnson County, Madison County, and Marion County are eligible counties. Authorizes eligible counties to fund approved public transportation projects through various parts of the local option income tax rates that are available under current law for other purposes. Requires that fares must cover at least 25% of the operating costs of a transportation system established or expanded under the bill. Requires that revenue raised from sources other than taxes and fares must: (1) equal at least 10% of the local option income tax revenue that the budget agency certifies that an eligible county will receive in the first year of operations of a public transportation project; and (2) cover at least 10% of the operating costs of a transportation system established or expanded under the bill in the second year and thereafter. Provides that eligible counties are responsible for covering any shortfalls in raising alternative revenues. Requires foundations to be established in eligible counties for the purpose of meeting the alternative revenue requirements. Authorizes interlocal agreements, public-private partnerships, and bonding with respect to a public transportation project. Prohibits a political subdivision from using public funds to promote a position on a local public question regarding transit. Provides that the provisions in the bill do not create a moral

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Central Indiana transit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 017605 (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Roll Call 017604 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 15 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy - Roll Call 017601 (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-26SenatePublic Law 153
2014-03-26SenateSigned by the Governor
2014-03-20SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-15HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-13HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 504: yeas 66 and nays 34
2014-03-13SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 443: yeas 32 and nays 16
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Stemler added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Austin added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Bauer added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative DeLaney added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Pryor added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Speedy added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Soliday added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Porter added as conferee
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Torr added as conferee
2014-03-04SenateSenator Taylor added as advisor
2014-03-04SenateSenator Hershman added as advisor
2014-03-04SenateSenator Lanane added as advisor
2014-03-04SenateSenator Waltz added as advisor
2014-03-04SenateSenator Breaux added as conferee
2014-03-04SenateSenator Pat Miller added as conferee
2014-03-04SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2014-03-03HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2014-03-03HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 375: yeas 52 and nays 47
2014-02-27HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2014-02-27HouseSB 176 Amendment #4 (Torr), prevailed.
2014-02-27HouseSB 176 Amendment #2 (Torr), prevailed.
2014-02-27HouseSB 176 Amendment #5 (DeLaney), prevailed.
2014-02-27HouseSB 176 Amendment #1 (Thompson), prevailed.
2014-02-25HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-02-17HouseReferred to Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2014-02-13HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-10HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Roads and Transportation
2014-02-04SenateRepresentative Pryor added as cosponsor.
2014-02-04SenateRepresentative Porter added as cosponsor.
2014-02-04SenateRepresentative Kirchhofer added as cosponsor.
2014-02-04SenateRepresentative Torr added sponsor.
2014-02-04SenateReferred to the House
2014-02-04SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 152: yeas 28 and nays 20
2014-02-03SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2014-02-03SenateSB 176 Amendment #9 (Hershman) motion withdrawn.
2014-02-03SenateSB 176 Amendment #4 (Tallian), failed.
2014-02-03SenateSB 176 Amendment #8 (Breaux), failed.
2014-02-03SenateSB 176 Amendment #5 (Miller, Pat), prevailed.
2014-02-03SenateSB 176 Amendment #1 (Kenley), prevailed.
2014-01-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-01-15SenateSenator Lanane added as coauthor.
2014-01-15SenateSenator Merritt added as third author.
2014-01-08SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Tax and Fiscal Policy
2014-01-08SenateSenator Waltz added as second author.
2014-01-08SenateAuthored by Senator Miller, Patricia.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/senate/176/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/8/d/328d1c52/SB0176.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/c/0/fbc037d3/SB0176.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/4/2/e14206ef/SB0176.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/a/4/27a46a76/SB0176.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/1/8/111880e7/SB0176.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/2/7/95273529/SB0176.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/4/1/6841dbc9/SB0176.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/b/e/e7be9576/SB0176.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/d/5/23d51c3d/SB0176.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/2/5/b625bf1e/SB0176.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/1/b/bd1b58e4/SB0176.06.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/0/9/4/9094b68b/SB0176.06.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/2/b/fc2bccec/SB0176.07.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/f/1/f2f1b7f0/SB0176.07.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/4/4/a0440e18/SB0176.08.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/2/1/bd210156/SB0176.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/b/7/b6b7bc96/SB0176.02.COMS.94.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/6/c/e76c4360/SB0176.03.ENGS.152.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/a/9/1/0a916d76/SB0176.04.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/5/e/105e3c4d/SB0176.05.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/5/e/ae5e847f/SB0176.07.COMH.375.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/8/7/1e87c67b/SB0176.07.COMH.504.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/0/9/970956ba/SB0176.07.COMH.443.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback