IN SB0175 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 54
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 54
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health care consent. Provides that an adult grandchild may consent to health care for an individual incapable of consenting if a health care representative has not been appointed, is not reasonably available, declines to act, or is unknown to the health care provider. Provides that a grandparent may consent to health care for a grandchild incapable of consenting if a health care representative has not been appointed, is not reasonably available, declines to act, or is unknown to the health care provider. Provides that a grandparent also may consent to health care for a minor grandchild if a guardian or
Title
Health care consent. Provides that an adult grandchild may consent to health care for an individual incapable of consenting if a health care representative has not been appointed, is not reasonably available, declines to act, or is unknown to the health care provider. Provides that a grandparent may consent to health care for a grandchild incapable of consenting if a health care representative has not been appointed, is not reasonably available, declines to act, or is unknown to the health care provider. Provides that a grandparent also may consent to health care for a minor grandchild if a guardian or
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Public Law 54 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-04 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2017-04-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 350: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2017-03-30 | House | Representative Bacon added as cosponsor |
2017-03-30 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2017-03-30 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-27 | House | Representatives Porter and Zent added as cosponsors |
2017-03-27 | House | Representative Shackleford added as cosponsor |
2017-03-27 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-03-16 | House | Reassigned to Committee on Public Health |
2017-03-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senator Walker added as coauthor |
2017-02-02 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Kirchhofer |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 55: yeas 44, nays 1 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Leising) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Koch) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senator Young M added as second author |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leising |