IN SB0172 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 111
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Survivor health coverage. Provides that, if the employer of a public safety officer who dies in the line of duty after June 30, 2019, offers health coverage for active employees, the employer shall offer to provide and pay for health coverage under the plan covering active employees for the surviving spouse and each natural child, stepchild, and adopted child of the public safety officer. Provides that health coverage for a surviving child continues: (1) until the child becomes 18 years of age; (2) until the child becomes 23 years of age, under certain circumstances; or (3) during the entire period of the child's physical or mental disability; whichever period is longest. Changes the application date from a death occurring after June 30, 2019, to a death occurring after December 31, 2017. Requires the department of local government finance to establish a state address confidentiality form to be used to restrict access to the home address of certain persons. Adds to the definition of "covered person" the surviving spouse of a covered person if the person is killed in the line of duty. Provides that the state address confidentiality form may be used when applying for address confidentiality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Survivor health coverage. Provides that, if the employer of a public safety officer who dies in the line of duty after June 30, 2019, offers health coverage for active employees, the employer shall offer to provide and pay for health coverage under the plan covering active employees for the surviving spouse and each natural child, stepchild, and adopted child of the public safety officer. Provides that health coverage for a surviving child continues: (1) until the child becomes 18 years of age; (2) until the child becomes 23 years of age, under certain circumstances; or (3) during the entire period of the child's physical or mental disability; whichever period is longest. Changes the application date from a death occurring after June 30, 2019, to a death occurring after December 31, 2017. Requires the department of local government finance to establish a state address confidentiality form to be used to restrict access to the home address of certain persons. Adds to the definition of "covered person" the surviving spouse of a covered person if the person is killed in the line of duty. Provides that the state address confidentiality form may be used when applying for address confidentiality.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenatePublic Law 111
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-17SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 518: yeas 47, nays 0
2019-04-15SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-04-11HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-04-09HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 432: yeas 96, nays 0
2019-04-08HouseRepresentative Goodin added as cosponsor
2019-04-08HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-28HouseRepresentative Speedy added as cosponsor
2019-03-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2019-02-06SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-04SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-04SenateSenator Houchin added as coauthor
2019-02-04SenateSenator Alting added as coauthor
2019-02-04SenateCosponsor: Representative Judy
2019-02-04SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Frye R
2019-02-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 62: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-01-31SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2019-01-31SenateSenator Doriot added as second author
2019-01-31SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-29SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Crider

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/172/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/2/7/ab27f6ed/SB0172.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/d/8/c5d8cd7c/SB0172.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/d/6/f6d61fb7/SB0172.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/5/9/87596a7b/SB0172.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/5/b/b15b4354/SB0172.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/b/f/94bfcf35/SB0172.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/4/c/254cf25e/SB0172.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/4/6/5346c0a5/SB0172.62.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/0/1/33015112/SB0172.02.COMS.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/9/0/4190d064/SB0172.432.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/a/6/cba6fa88/SB0172.518.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback