IN SB0172 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 53
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 53
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sales tax on recreational vehicles and cargo trailers. Provides that in the case of a transaction that: (1) occurs after June 30, 2017, and before July 1, 2019; (2) is not exempt from sales tax; and (3) involves a cargo trailer or recreational vehicle that: (A) is purchased by a nonresident; (B) the purchaser intends to transport outside Indiana and title or register in another state or country; and (C) will not be titled or registered in Indiana; the sales tax rate on the cargo trailer or recreational vehicle is the rate of the other state or other country in
Title
Sales tax on recreational vehicles and cargo trailers. Provides that in the case of a transaction that: (1) occurs after June 30, 2017, and before July 1, 2019; (2) is not exempt from sales tax; and (3) involves a cargo trailer or recreational vehicle that: (A) is purchased by a nonresident; (B) the purchaser intends to transport outside Indiana and title or register in another state or country; and (C) will not be titled or registered in Indiana; the sales tax rate on the cargo trailer or recreational vehicle is the rate of the other state or other country in
Sponsors
Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Joseph Zakas [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] |
Rep. Robert Cherry [R] | Rep. William Friend [R] | Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Sheila Klinker [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Public Law 53 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2017-03-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 285: yeas 96, nays 1 |
2017-03-20 | House | Representative Klinker added as cosponsor |
2017-03-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Friend and Miller |
2017-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Cherry |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 66: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as coauthor |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Senator Glick added as second author |
2017-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Doriot |