IN SB0170 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Public Law 98
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Public Law 98
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child fatality report information. Specifies that the report concerning child fatalities in Indiana must be completed before December 31 of each year for the preceding calendar year and include information concerning whether the death occurred: (1) while the child was placed in foster care; or (2) after the child, who was once placed in foster care, was returned to a natural parent.
Title
Child fatality report information. Specifies that the report concerning child fatalities in Indiana must be completed before December 31 of each year for the preceding calendar year and include information concerning whether the death occurred: (1) while the child was placed in foster care; or (2) after the child, who was once placed in foster care, was returned to a natural parent.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] |
Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] |
Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Mark Stoops [D] | Rep. Cindy Ziemke [R] | Rep. Melanie Wright [D] |
Rep. Pat Boy [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Public Law 98 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 360: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2019-03-26 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2019-03-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 337: yeas 89, nays 0 |
2019-03-21 | House | Representative Boy added as cosponsor |
2019-03-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senators Becker and Glick added as coauthors |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Wright |
2019-01-24 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Ziemke |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 25: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Leising) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Senators Kruse and Ford J.D. added as coauthors |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as coauthor |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as third author |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Senator Head added as second author |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leising |