IN SB0169 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Makes it a Level 5 felony for a person to provide an individual with a firearm if the person knows that the individual: (1) is legally ineligible to possess a firearm; or (2) intends to use the firearm to commit a crime; and increases the penalty to a Level 3 felony if the firearm is used to commit murder. Provides a defense for certain persons accused of providing firearms to ineligible individuals if: (1) the accused person contacted NICS to request a background check on the individual; and (2) the accused person received authorization from NICS to provide the firearm to the individual. Makes theft a Level 6 felony instead of a Class A misdemeanor if the property involved is a firearm. Allows the state to seek a sentencing enhancement of from five years to 20 years if a person uses a firearm to commit: (1) a felony against the person that results in death or serious bodily injury; (2) kidnapping; or (3) criminal confinement as a Level 2 or Level 3 felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 75 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 016903 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Roll Call 016901 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-26SenateSigned by the Governor
2014-03-26SenatePublic Law 152
2014-03-20SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-15HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-13HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 503: yeas 100 and nays 0
2014-03-13SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 436: yeas 47 and nays 0
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Pierce added as advisor
2014-03-04HouseRepresentative Moed added as advisor
2014-03-04HouseRepresentative Steuerwald added as advisor
2014-03-04HouseRepresentative Cox added as advisor
2014-03-04HouseRepresentative McMillin added as conferee
2014-03-04HouseRepresentative DeLaney added as conferee
2014-03-03SenateSenator Steele added as advisor
2014-03-03SenateSenator Hume added as advisor
2014-03-03SenateSenator Merritt added as advisor
2014-03-03SenateSenator Arnold added as conferee
2014-03-03SenateSenator M. Young added as conferee
2014-03-03SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2014-02-27HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2014-02-27HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 334: yeas 93 and nays 0
2014-02-26HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
2014-02-26HouseSB 169 Amendment #1 (DeLaney), prevailed.
2014-02-26HouseSB 169 Amendment #2 (DeLaney), prevailed.
2014-02-24HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-13HouseRepresentative Moed added as cosponsor.
2014-02-13HouseRepresentative Lucas added as cosponsor.
2014-02-10HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code
2014-02-04SenateRepresentative Frizzell added as cosponsor.
2014-02-04SenateRepresentative Steuerwald added as cosponsor.
2014-02-04SenateRepresentative McMillin added sponsor.
2014-02-04SenateReferred to the House
2014-02-04SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 148: yeas 43 and nays 5
2014-02-03SenateSenator Arnold added as coauthor.
2014-02-03SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2014-02-03SenateSB 169 Amendment #2 (Young, M.), prevailed.
2014-01-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-01-21SenateSenator Steele added as third author.
2014-01-16SenateSenator Merritt added as second author.
2014-01-08SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Corrections & Criminal Law
2014-01-08SenateAuthored by Senator Young R Michael

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/senate/169/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/d/5/9ad56fce/SB0169.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/a/8/7ea8d54d/SB0169.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/b/a/e5ba9f4b/SB0169.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/b/e/a2becb40/SB0169.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/a/6/6aa61260/SB0169.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/2/6/d426f03d/SB0169.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/8/9/42891e69/SB0169.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/4/6/fa460439/SB0169.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/e/4/09e436f8/SB0169.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/0/f/e30f4bec/SB0169.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/c/b/38cb1092/SB0169.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/9/c/9d9c1c32/SB0169.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/3/3/b4334578/SB0169.03.ENGS.148.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/e/d/32edb008/SB0169.03.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/9/d/329d40c9/SB0169.04.COMH.301.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/a/b/9/aab942bb/SB0169.04.COMH.300.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/d/b/e3dbaa43/SB0169.05.ENGH.334.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/4/d/f24d70cb/SB0169.05.ENGH.503.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/c/7/d9c7d0c4/SB0169.05.ENGH.436.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback