IN SB0168 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

IMPD study committee. Urges the legislative council to assign to an interim study committee the topic of the administration of the Indianapolis Marion County police department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IMPD study committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-02SenateSenator Freeman added as third author
2021-02-02SenateSenator Baldwin added as second author
2021-02-02SenateSenator Baldwin removed as coauthor
2021-02-02SenateSenator Freeman removed as second author
2021-01-14SenateSenators Rogers, Grooms, Young M, Zay, Houchin, Gaskill, Doriot, Garten, Koch added as coauthors
2021-01-14SenateSenator Freeman added as second author
2021-01-12SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2021-01-12SenateCoauthored by Senator Baldwin
2021-01-12SenateAuthored by Senator Sandlin

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback