IN SB0165 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Noncompliant prosecutor. Permits the attorney general to request the appointment of a special prosecuting attorney if a prosecuting attorney is categorically refusing to prosecute certain crimes, and establishes a procedure for the appointment of a person to serve as a special prosecuting attorney to prosecute cases that the county prosecuting attorney is refusing to prosecute.
Title
Noncompliant prosecutor.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] | Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Rep. Chris Jeter [R] |
Rep. John Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Lanane) failed (Y: 10 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Lanane) failed (Y: 10 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Young J |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Jeter |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 152: yeas 37, nays 11 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Lanane) failed; Roll Call 99: yeas 10, nays 38 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as third author |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senator Sandlin added as second author |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young M |