IN SB0162 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 149
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Chronic pain management. Requires state employee health plans, Medicaid, policies of accident and sickness insurance, and health maintenance organization contracts to provide coverage for chronic pain management. Requires the office of Medicaid policy and planning to apply for any Medicaid state plan amendment necessary to provide the coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chronic pain management. Requires state employee health plans, Medicaid, policies of accident and sickness insurance, and health maintenance organization contracts to provide coverage for chronic pain management. Requires the office of Medicaid policy and planning to apply for any Medicaid state plan amendment necessary to provide the coverage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenatePublic Law 149
2019-05-01SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-17SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 517: yeas 47, nays 0
2019-04-15SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-04-11HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-04-09HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 431: yeas 94, nays 2
2019-04-08HouseAmendment #1 (Zent) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-08HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
2019-02-27SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-26SenateSenator Grooms added as coauthor
2019-02-26SenateCosponsors: Representatives Kirchhofer, Shackleford and Lindauer
2019-02-26SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Zent
2019-02-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 216: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-02-25SenateSenator Zay added as coauthor
2019-02-25SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-25SenateSenator Bassler added as third author
2019-02-25SenateSenator Merritt added as second author
2019-02-25SenateAmendment #1 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-25SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Messmer

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/162/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/f/0/d3f0fac2/SB0162.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/3/5/27357c8f/SB0162.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/f/2/5ef2d3ac/SB0162.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/5/5/e2550528/SB0162.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/7/1/6c715147/SB0162.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/5/d/eb5d21a5/SB0162.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/3/a/f93aa2de/SB0162.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/0/3/4f034547/SB0162.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/f/9/f3f9f9d8/SB0162.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/5/1/f55131f6/SB0162.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/2/1/cc214ae8/SB0162.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/1/c/1c1c1086/SB0162.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/e/6/14e68ccc/SB0162.216.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/8/3/32831371/SB0162.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/d/7/e9d7bb97/SB0162.431.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/7/a/377a9454/SB0162.517.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback