IN SB0159 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

State examiner findings. Specifies requirements for corrective action when audited entities fail to comply with certain guidelines or laws. Requires an audited entity to file a corrective action plan following findings of noncompliance in two consecutive examination reports. Specifies actions that the audit committee may take if an audited entity fails to comply with a corrective action plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State examiner findings. Specifies requirements for corrective action when audited entities fail to comply with certain guidelines or laws. Requires an audited entity to file a corrective action plan following findings of noncompliance in two consecutive examination reports. Specifies actions that the audit committee may take if an audited entity fails to comply with a corrective action plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-28HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2017-01-25SenateReferred to the House
2017-01-24SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Slager
2017-01-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 24: yeas 47, nays 0
2017-01-23SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-01-23SenateAmendment #1 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
2017-01-23SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-01-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2017-01-04SenateAuthored by Senator Niemeyer

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback