IN SB0159 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Representative Moed added as advisor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Representative Moed added as advisor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds a definition of an "adult high school". Repeals a provision that prohibits the establishment of new adult high schools. Provides that an adult high school may only be authorized by the Indiana charter school board or the Indianapolis charter school board. Provides that, after June 30, 2014, before an authorizer may grant a charter to establish or renew a charter for an adult high school, the organizer must have the proposal approved by the budget committee. Requires a charter for an adult high school to contain certain requirements. Provides that, with certain exceptions, for state fiscal years beginning after June 30, 2014, an adult high school is not entitled to receive funding from the state unless the general assembly enacts an appropriation for the adult high school. Provides that an adult high school is subject to alternative accountability system established by the state board. Provides that certain authorizers may collect a 3% administrative fee from the amount appropriated to an adult high school (Current law provides that an authorizer may collect the administrative fee from the charter schools basic tuition support) Requires the office of management and budget to study adult high schools and educational alternatives for students who: (1) are at least eighteen (18) years of age; and (2) have dropped out of high school before receiving a diploma.
Title
Charter schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Howard Kenley [R] | Sen. Earline Rogers [D] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Todd Huston [R] | Rep. Terry Goodin [D] | Rep. Justin Moed [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 015903 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 015901 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 015903 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 015901 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | House | Representative Moed added as advisor |
2014-03-11 | House | Representative Goodin added as advisor |
2014-03-11 | House | Representative Errington added as advisor |
2014-03-11 | House | Representative Huston added as advisor |
2014-03-11 | House | Representative Behning added as advisor |
2014-03-11 | House | Representative V. Smith added as conferee |
2014-03-11 | House | Representative T. Brown added as conferee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as advisor |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as advisor |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as conferee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senator Kenley added as conferee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2014-03-03 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-03-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 366: yeas 97 and nays 0 |
2014-03-03 | House | Representative Moed added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-27 | House | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Education |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Representative Huston added as cosponsor. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Representative Goodin added as cosponsor. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Representative T. Brown added as sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 65: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-01-27 | Senate | SB 159 Amendment #1 (Kenley), prevailed. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass amend, adopted. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as third author. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second author. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Education and Career Development |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kenley |