IN SB0158 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Public Law 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Public Law 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Domestic violence. Provides that a person arrested for certain crimes committed against a family or household member may not be released on bail for 24 hours. Provides that a charge of invasion of privacy is elevated to a Level 6 felony if the person has a prior unrelated criminal stalking conviction. Provides that certain crimes are considered a serious violent felony for the purposes of unlawful possession of a firearm by a serious violent felon.
Title
Domestic violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Public Law 28 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 317: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2023-03-22 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2023-03-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 279: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2023-03-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-03-16 | House | Representative Shackleford added as cosponsor |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2023-02-27 | House | Representative Rowray E added as cosponsor |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senator Alting added as coauthor |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2023-02-13 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative McNamara |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 101: yeas 47, nays 2 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Amendment #11 (Crider) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Amendment #10 (Young M) failed; voice vote |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senator Becker added as coauthor |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senators Sandlin, Bohacek, Freeman, Koch, Glick added as coauthors |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Senator Baldwin added as third author |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Senator Garten added as second author |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crider |