IN SB0157 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Public Law 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Public Law 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Disposition of real property by INDOT. Provides that an agency real estate professional may determine the fair market value of real property the department of transportation (INDOT) owns and is seeking to sell under certain conditions. Makes conforming changes. Provides that real property shall be appraised prior to acquisition by INDOT, except under certain conditions concerning donation and valuation of the real property. Requires INDOT to prepare a waiver valuation if an appraisal is unnecessary. Suspends certain rules for persons preparing or reviewing a waiver valuation. Provides that INDOT may sell real property without advertising or competitive bids under certain circumstances. Extends the sunset of certain public-private agreement provisions from June 30, 2023, to June 30, 2031.
Title
Disposition of real property by INDOT.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 79 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Public Law 12 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-02-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-02-16 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2022-02-15 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 188: yeas 79, nays 11 |
2022-02-14 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-31 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-18 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Pressel |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 19: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as second author |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crider |