IN SB0157 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Reassigns duties from the Great Lakes task force to the environmental quality service council to review and discuss various topics related to the supply and quality of water in the Great Lakes . Modifies duties to add review of federal funds for water protection, infrastructure conditions and regulatory matters affecting shipping, and other relevant matters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Great Lakes task force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 62
2011-04-26 Signed by the Governor
2011-04-19 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-18 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-14 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-12 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2011-04-12 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 481: yeas 90, nays 0
2011-04-11 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-04-07 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
2011-02-14 Cosponsor: Rep. Soliday
2011-02-14 House sponsor: Rep. Dermody
2011-02-14 Referred to the House
2011-02-14 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 115: yeas 48 and nays 1
2011-02-10 Senators Mishler and Broden added as coauthors
2011-02-10 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-02-08 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-02-07 Senators Rogers, Yoder and Randolph added as coauthors
2011-01-31 Senator Gard added as coauthor
2011-01-12 Senators Tallian, Mrvan and Landske added as coauthors
2011-01-12 Senator Charbonneau added as second author
2011-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Energy and Environmental Affairs
2011-01-05 Authored by Senator Zakas

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback