IN SB0156 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Public Law 26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Public Law 26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tax sales. Provides that a person who acquires a certificate of sale (certificate) may not assign the certificate to a person who was not eligible under the tax sale laws to bid on or purchase real property at a tax sale until the person satisfies the eligibility requirements as determined by the county auditor. Requires a person to acknowledge that the person will not assign a certificate for any real property purchased to a person who is prohibited from bidding on or purchasing real property at a tax sale. Requires the county auditor to determine that an assignee of a certificate is eligible to receive the assignment for an assignment to be valid. Provides that assignments of a certificate must be included on the county auditor's tax sale record. Requires the county, the county auditor, or a county vendor to list certain information concerning tax sales on the website of the county, county auditor, or county vendor for a specified period of time. Specifies that a county or a county vendor is not liable for an act or omission related to making information available on a website.
Title
Tax sales.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Public Law 26 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 316: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2023-03-24 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2023-03-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 294: yeas 89, nays 1 |
2023-03-21 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-03-21 | House | Amendment #1 (Slager) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-03-20 | House | Representative Pryor added as cosponsor |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-03-14 | House | Representative Jackson added as cosponsor |
2023-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senator Gaskill added as coauthor |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Engleman |
2023-02-13 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Slager |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 100: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senator Pol added as third author |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Senator Dernulc added as second author |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Niemeyer |