IN SB0156 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Public Law 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Public Law 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fire protection district per diems. Increases the maximum amount (from $20 to $100) that a member of the board of fire trustees of a fire protection district may receive for each day that the member devotes to the work of the district.
Title
Fire protection district per diems. Increases the maximum amount (from $20 to $100) that a member of the board of fire trustees of a fire protection district may receive for each day that the member devotes to the work of the district.
Sponsors
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] | Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] |
Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] | Rep. Chris Campbell [D] | Rep. Carolyn Jackson [D] | Rep. Randall Frye [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Public Law 4 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-03-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-03-13 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2019-03-12 | House | Representative Frye added as cosponsor |
2019-03-12 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 309: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2019-03-07 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Campbell and Jackson |
2019-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Soliday |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 61: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as third author |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senator Niemeyer added as second author |
2019-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Randolph |