IN SB0156 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Public Law 165
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Public Law 165
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Drug and alcohol treatment reporting. Adds additional reporting requirements for opioid treatment programs. Requires the office of the secretary of family and social services, with the assistance of the state department of health and the department of administration, to report to the legislative council a comprehensive plan to increase the number of inpatient and residential beds used for detoxification, treatment, and rehabilitation, including the: (1) number of hospital beds currently available in Indiana; (2) location and physical description of state owned buildings that are currently available, or expected to be available before July 1, 2018, for conversion and use; and
Title
Drug and alcohol treatment reporting. Adds additional reporting requirements for opioid treatment programs. Requires the office of the secretary of family and social services, with the assistance of the state department of health and the department of administration, to report to the legislative council a comprehensive plan to increase the number of inpatient and residential beds used for detoxification, treatment, and rehabilitation, including the: (1) number of hospital beds currently available in Indiana; (2) location and physical description of state owned buildings that are currently available, or expected to be available before July 1, 2018, for conversion and use; and
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Public Law 165 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 472: yeas 45, nays 0 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2017-04-05 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2017-04-05 | House | Representatives Brown, C. and Ziemke added as cosponsors |
2017-04-04 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 375: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2017-04-03 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Kirchhofer |
2017-02-02 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Clere |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 54: yeas 45, nays 0 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Merritt) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2017-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Merritt |