IN SB0156 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-25 - Senator Holdman added as author
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-25 - Senator Holdman added as author
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sales tax on recreational vehicles. Provides that the purchase of a recreational vehicle or cargo trailer that is transported out of Indiana for registration and use in another state or country is exempt from the state gross retail tax regardless of whether the destination state or country provides a similar exemption for Indiana residents.
Title
Sales tax on recreational vehicles. Provides that the purchase of a recreational vehicle or cargo trailer that is transported out of Indiana for registration and use in another state or country is exempt from the state gross retail tax regardless of whether the destination state or country provides a similar exemption for Indiana residents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as author |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senator Yoder removed as author |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Senator Broden added as coauthor |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2016-01-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Yoder |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/senate/156/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/a/5/4da5bc0f/SB0156.01.INTR.pdf |