IN SB0154 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Allows a person to carry a loaded and operational firearm while operating an off-road vehicle or snowmobile if: (1) the firearm is a handgun and the person has been issued an unlimited handgun license; (2) the firearm is a handgun and the person is not required to possess a license to carry a handgun; or (3) the person is operating the vehicle on property that the person owns, has a contractual interest in, legally possesses, or has permission from the owner to possess a firearm on.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms on off-road vehicles or snowmobiles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 83 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 35
2011-04-20 Signed by the Governor
2011-04-15 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-13 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-12 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-08 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2011-04-08 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 424: yeas 83, nays 6
2011-04-07 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-04-04 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2011-01-27 Senator Boots added as coauthor
2011-01-27 Cosponsors: Reps. Ubelhor, Davisson and Grubb
2011-01-27 House sponsor: Rep. Eberhart
2011-01-27 Referred to the House
2011-01-27 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 48: yeas 45 and nays 1
2011-01-25 Senator Kruse added as coauthor
2011-01-24 Senator Buck added as second author
2011-01-24 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-01-20 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters
2011-01-05 Authored by Senator Steele

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback