IN SB0152 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 235
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Property tax assessments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property tax assessments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 235
2013-05-11SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-05-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-26SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-26SenateConference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 541: yeas 50, nays 0
2013-04-25HouseConference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 604: yeas 97, nays 0
2013-04-25HouseRules suspended
2013-04-22HouseHouse advisors appointed: M. Smith, Dermody and Klinker
2013-04-22HouseHouse conferees appointed: Davis and Kersey
2013-04-18SenateSenate advisors appointed: Hershman, Taylor, Schneider and Smith
2013-04-18SenateSenate conferee appointed: Eckerty and Broden
2013-04-18SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2013-04-10HouseRepresentatives Dermody, Stemler and Errington added as cosponsors
2013-04-10HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-04-10HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 446: yeas 94, nays 0
2013-04-08HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-04-04HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2013-02-05SenateSenator Becker added as coauthor
2013-02-05SenateSenator Landske added as coauthor
2013-02-04SenateSenator Schneider added as second author
2013-02-04SenateSenator Smith added as coauthor
2013-02-04SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Davis
2013-02-04SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 57: yeas 49 and nays 0
2013-01-31SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-01-29SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2013-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Eckerty

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback