IN SB0151 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a grantee is entitled to a statement from the association, manager, or board of directors of a condominium, setting forth the amount of the unpaid assessments against the grantor, and specifies a procedure for the grantee to obtain a statement of unpaid assessments. Provides that a grantee is not liable for unpaid assessments if the association, manager, or board fails to provide a statement of unpaid assessments within seven days of the grantee's written request.
Title
Condominium unit liens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Civil Law - Roll Call 015101 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Civil Law - Roll Call 015101 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Karickhoff added sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 146: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Returned to second reading |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as second author. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Civil Law |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Zakas. |