IN SB0150 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Housing matters. Eliminates the general restriction on the authority of a county, city, town, or township concerning regulation of landlord-tenant relationship matters not specifically described by state statute.
Title
Housing matters.
Sponsors
Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Rep. Ethan Manning [R] |
Rep. Gerald Torr [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #4 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 11 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #3 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 14 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 13 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #4 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 11 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #3 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 14 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 13 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Torr |
2021-02-16 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Manning |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 121: yeas 45, nays 0 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senator Sandlin added as second author |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Yoder) failed; voice vote |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Ford J.D.) failed; voice vote |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 103: yeas 11, nays 35 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 102: yeas 14, nays 32 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 101: yeas 15, nays 31 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 100: yeas 13, nays 30 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senator Buck added as author |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senator Bray removed as author |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bray |