IN SB0144 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Public Law 68
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alcohol matters. Provides that the bulk wine purchasing limits for farm wineries apply only to wine sold directly to a consumer in Indiana, and that no limit is imposed on the amount of bulk wine that may be used in producing wine sold through a wholesaler or sold outside of Indiana. Allows the holder of an artisan distiller permit to also hold a distiller's permit. Provides that a holder of an artisan distiller's permit that also holds an interest in a distiller's permit may manufacture and bottle liquor on the same equipment on the premises of the artisan distillery. Requires a permit holder to store liquor manufactured or bottled under an artisan distiller's permit in an area separate and distinct at all times from the liquor manufactured under a distiller's permit. Also requires that the manufacture, bottling, and storage of liquor under certain provisions must conform with federal laws, rules, and regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcohol matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Floor - (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19SenatePublic Law 68
2021-04-19SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-04-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-08SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 372: yeas 40, nays 7
2021-04-06SenateMotion to concur filed
2021-04-06HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-04-05HouseRepresentative Ellington added as cosponsor
2021-04-05HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 351: yeas 93, nays 2
2021-04-01HouseRepresentative Austin added as cosponsor
2021-04-01HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-30HouseRepresentative Mayfield added as sponsor
2021-03-30HouseRepresentative Smaltz removed as sponsor
2021-03-29HouseRepresentatives Mayfield and Austin removed as cosponsors
2021-03-29HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-09HouseRepresentative Austin added as cosponsor
2021-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2021-02-24SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-23SenateCosponsor: Representative Mayfield
2021-02-23SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Smaltz
2021-02-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 174: yeas 42, nays 6
2021-02-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-18SenateSenator Grooms added as coauthor
2021-02-18SenateSenator Ford Jon added as third author
2021-02-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-15SenateSenator Alting added as second author
2021-02-11SenateSenator Messmer added as author
2021-02-11SenateSenator Bray removed as author
2021-02-11SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Public Policy
2021-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2021-01-04SenateAuthored by Senator Bray

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/144/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/7/4/52746f5c/SB0144.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/c/6/8bc66788/SB0144.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/2/3/07235de6/SB0144.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/c/5/80c5ebf3/SB0144.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/2/d/812d3b75/SB0144.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/6/f/196fb1c9/SB0144.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/a/a/6baacd38/SB0144.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/2/e/822ea4b8/SB0144.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/d/f/07df6c50/SB0144.05.ENRH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/5/a/f85ad0f1/SB0144.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/2/a/872a0244/SB0144.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/3/4/0b3488bd/SB0144.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/1/0/c210a21b/SB0144.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/3/8/76380234/SB0144.02.COMS.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/6/e/2b6e3d62/SB0144.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/e/e/70eed71d/SB0144.03.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/3/9/89391090/SB0144.04.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/b/5/bfb5ef0e/SB0144.03.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/4/3/cf43242c/SB0144.04.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/a/7/1ca78311/SB0144.04.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/7/9/2b799c76/SB0144.04.COMH.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/1/7/8d176fb1/SB0144.05.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/f/a/64fa32be/SB0144.02.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/5/6/c0569834/SB0144.174_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/0/b/730b8013/SB0144.03.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/9/9/cc99de24/SB0144.351_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/1/5/3c1509c5/SB0144.372_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback