IN SB0143 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
Pending: House Elections and Apportionment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Election workers. Eliminates a restriction prohibiting a nephew or niece of a candidate from serving as: (1) a precinct election officer; (2) a member of an absentee voter board; (3) an absentee ballot counter; or (4) an absentee ballot courier.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election workers. Eliminates a restriction prohibiting a nephew or niece of a candidate from serving as: (1) a precinct election officer; (2) a member of an absentee voter board; (3) an absentee ballot counter; or (4) an absentee ballot courier.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on Elections - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-02HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
2015-02-03SenateReferred to the House
2015-01-22SenateSenator Walker added as coauthor
2015-01-22SenateRepresentative Bacon added as sponsor
2015-01-22SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 21: yeas 37, nays 12
2015-01-20SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2015-01-20SenateSenator Becker added as second author
2015-01-20SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-01-12SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-06SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Elections
2015-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Tomes

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback