IN SB0143 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - House advisors appointed: Turner, Crouch, Klinker and Goodin
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - House advisors appointed: Turner, Crouch, Klinker and Goodin
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for an automatic refundable tax credit to Indiana residents when the state has excess reserves of at least $20,000,000. Transfers any part of the excess reserves that are not needed to provide tax credits to the pension stabilization fund. Provides that beginning in 2013: (1) the office of management and budget shall calculate, after the end of each odd- numbered state fiscal year, the total amount of state reserves; and (2) the governor's presentation concerning the disposition of excess state reserves is conditioned upon the determination that the state reserves exceed 12% (instead of 10%) of the general revenue appropriations for the current state fiscal year. Permits augmentation of the appropriation for full-day kindergarten. Changes the amount distributed per child.
Title
State fiscal matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 2 (Broden), failed (Y: 14 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 2 (Broden), failed (Y: 14 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | House advisors appointed: Turner, Crouch, Klinker and Goodin | |
2012-03-01 | House conferees appointed: Espich and Crawford | |
2012-02-29 | Senate advisor appointed: Charbonneau and Rogers | |
2012-02-29 | Senate conferee appointed: Kenley and Broden | |
2012-02-29 | Senate dissented from House amendments | |
2012-02-27 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2012-02-27 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 234: yeas 97, nays 2 | |
2012-02-23 | Amendment 1 (Day), ruled out of order | |
2012-02-23 | Amendment 2 (VanDenburgh), ruled out of order | |
2012-02-23 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-20 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-31 | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-01-24 | Cosponsor: Rep. Crawford | |
2012-01-24 | House sponsor: Rep. Espich | |
2012-01-24 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-24 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 63: yeas 36 and nays 14 | |
2012-01-23 | Amendment 1 (Broden), failed; voice vote | |
2012-01-23 | Amendment 2 (Broden), failed; Roll Call 50: yeas 14, nays 36 | |
2012-01-23 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-20 | Senator Charbonneau added as second author | |
2012-01-19 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senator Kenley |