IN SB0142 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Age verification for tobacco and vaping sales. Makes it a Class C infraction if a person or retail establishment sells or distributes tobacco, an e-liquid, or an electronic cigarette without performing age verification of the purchaser with scanning technology or an automated software system. Provides that a good faith effort to verify the age of a purchaser of e-liquids includes performing age verification with scanning technology or an automated software system.
Title
Age verification for tobacco and vaping sales.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | Senate | Withdrawn |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as second author |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as author |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Senator Bray removed as author |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Public Policy |
2021-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bray |