IN SB0142 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid reimbursement for schools. Allows the office of the secretary of family and social services to apply for a Medicaid state plan amendment to allow school corporations to seek Medicaid reimbursement for medically necessary, school-based Medicaid covered services that are provided under federal or state mandates. Specifies possible services for Medicaid reimbursement. Adds physical therapy to the list of services a school psychologist may refer a student. Allows a school psychologist to make referrals to physical therapists for mandated school services.
Title
Medicaid reimbursement for schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Barrett and Davisson |
2020-01-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Karickhoff |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 69: yeas 45, nays 5 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Melton added as coauthor |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senators Crider and Leising added as coauthors |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senators Becker, Breaux, Ruckelshaus added as coauthors |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as coauthor |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as third author |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Zay |