IN SB0142 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Renames the disabled veteran license plate the disabled Hoosier veteran license plate. Provides that a person who receives a disabled Hoosier veteran license plate due to a walking impairment must have a service connected disability of lower than 40%. Provides for only one design for disabled Hoosier veteran license plates. Repeals the provision requiring two distinct designs for disabled veteran license plates.
Title
Disabled Hoosier veteran license plate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation | |
2010-02-02 | Senators Hume, Kruse, Landske, Steele, Walker, Stutzman, Schneider, M. Young, Yoder, Charbonneau, Buck and Holdman added as coauthors | |
2010-02-02 | Senator Wyss added as third author | |
2010-02-02 | Cosponsor: Rep. Dodge | |
2010-02-02 | House sponsor: Rep. Reske | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the House | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 104: Yeas 49 and Nays 0 | |
2010-02-01 | Senator Leising added as second author | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation & Veterans Affairs | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Senator Delph |