IN SB0141 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal gang organization. Changes the term "criminal gang" to "criminal organization". Provides that a criminal organization is a group organized to commit a felony or the crime of battery. Increases the penalty for assisting a criminal to a Level 6 felony if the person who commits the offense or the person assisted is a member of a criminal organization. Makes criminal organization activity a Level 6 felony, and increases the penalty to a Level 5 felony if the person commits an offense involving the unlawful use of a firearm. Specifies certain additional evidence that the trier-of-fact may consider in determining
Title
Criminal gang organization. Changes the term "criminal gang" to "criminal organization". Provides that a criminal organization is a group organized to commit a felony or the crime of battery. Increases the penalty for assisting a criminal to a Level 6 felony if the person who commits the offense or the person assisted is a member of a criminal organization. Makes criminal organization activity a Level 6 felony, and increases the penalty to a Level 5 felony if the person commits an offense involving the unlawful use of a firearm. Specifies certain additional evidence that the trier-of-fact may consider in determining
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. Michael Delph [R] |
Sen. James Buck [R] | Rep. Cindy Kirchhofer [R] | Rep. Edward DeLaney [D] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | Public Law 25 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-02-24 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2016-02-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 223: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2016-02-22 | House | Representative Koch added as cosponsor |
2016-02-22 | House | Amendment #1 (DeLaney) ruled out of order |
2016-02-22 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-18 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Senator Delph added as coauthor |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative DeLaney |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as third author |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Senator Steele added as second author |
2016-01-21 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Kirchhofer |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 37: yeas 44, nays 4 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Young R Michael) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young R Michael |