IN SB0138 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Removes restrictions on grants from the victim services division of the Indiana criminal justice institute for certain entities to enter into a contract with the domestic violence prevention and treatment council. Provides that a court may allow a victim advocate to attend a civil proceeding and confer with a victim as necessary. Specifies that a victim advocate is not considered to be practicing law when performing certain services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Victim advocates in civil proceedings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 013802 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 013801 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-26SenateSigned by the Governor
2014-03-26SenatePublic Law 150
2014-03-10SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-10SenateSigned by the Speaker
2014-02-27HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2014-02-27HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 328: yeas 94 and nays 0
2014-02-26HouseSecond reading: engrossed.
2014-02-24HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-02-04HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Judiciary
2014-01-28SenateRepresentative Lawson added as cosponsor.
2014-01-28SenateRepresentative Kubacki added as sponsor.
2014-01-28SenateReferred to the House
2014-01-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 60: yeas 49 and nays 0
2014-01-27SenateSecond reading: engrossed
2014-01-27SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor.
2014-01-23SenateSenator Hume added as coauthor.
2014-01-23SenateSenator Zakas added as coauthor.
2014-01-23SenateSenator Steele added as coauthor.
2014-01-23SenateSenator Delph added as coauthor.
2014-01-23SenateSenator M. Young added as second author.
2014-01-23SenateCommittee report; do pass; adopted
2014-01-08SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Judiciary
2014-01-08SenateAuthored by Senator Becker

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/senate/138/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/2/5/07257bfd/SB0138.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/8/c/758c1042/SB0138.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/8/9/b489eb7b/SB0138.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/3/1/ce31e58a/SB0138.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/7/1/a971f838/SB0138.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/7/5/ad751220/SB0138.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/3/4/2b34c128/SB0138.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/f/5/95f528ad/SB0138.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/8/2/7/a8276e8c/SB0138.02.COMS.60.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/7/e/e77ed3b1/SB0138.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/c/8/49c88cfa/SB0138.03.COMH.328.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback