IN SB0133 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Public Law 119
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Sentencing. Provides that a court may suspend only that part of a sentence that is in excess of the minimum sentence for a person convicted of a Level 2 or Level 3 felony who has a prior unrelated felony conviction, other than a conviction for a felony involving marijuana, hashish, hash oil, or salvia divinorum. (Current law provides that a court may suspend any part of a sentence for certain Level 2 and Level 3 felony convictions, including drug related convictions.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentencing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 72 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26SenatePublic Law 119
2021-04-26SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-04-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-22HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-21SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-13SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 431: yeas 43, nays 7
2021-04-09SenateMotion to concur filed
2021-04-09HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-04-08HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 373: yeas 72, nays 16
2021-04-05HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-04-01HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-11HouseRepresentative Olthoff added as cosponsor
2021-03-01HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2021-02-05SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-04SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2021-02-02SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Speedy
2021-02-02SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 44: yeas 47, nays 0
2021-02-01SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-28SenateSenators Young M, Koch, Walker K, Bohacek added as coauthors
2021-01-28SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2021-01-05SenateAuthored by Senators Freeman and Sandlin

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/133/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/2/3/d92307f6/SB0133.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/b/5/b5b5930a/SB0133.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/5/6/7656f2cd/SB0133.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/e/3/97e3c9d2/SB0133.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/0/b/f00bf781/SB0133.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/6/0/5660e386/SB0133.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/8/2/57822d2b/SB0133.04.ENRH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/d/6/73d64247/SB0133.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/e/c/deec20d9/SB0133.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/d/b/d5db3fe1/SB0133.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/f/8/2ff8f7fb/SB0133.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/8/a/778a6859/SB0133.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/0/8/1008ad09/SB0133.02.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/7/a/f47ab22b/SB0133.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/9/2/2b92e3d7/SB0133.03.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/b/4/6ab4fd49/SB0133.03.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/e/1/6ae12baf/SB0133.03.COMH.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/5/7/43578376/SB0133.04.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/0/0/7d00d73a/SB0133.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/b/7/5fb75b66/SB0133.44_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/d/1/74d1d1ee/SB0133.02.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/3/a/e13a1be2/SB0133.373_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/8/5/dc854d12/SB0133.431_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback