IN SB0133 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Statute of limitations on enforcement of judgments.
Title
Statute of limitations on enforcement of judgments.
Sponsors
Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Thomas Wyss [R] | Sen. Michael Delph [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Senator Wyss added as coauthor |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Senators Delph and Randolph added as coauthors |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Senator Steele added as second author |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Senator Steele removed as coauthor |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Cosponsors: Reps. Zent and GiaQuinta |
2013-01-24 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Smaltz |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 17: yeas 43 and nays 4 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Senator Steele added as coauthor |
2013-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kruse |