IN SB0132 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Public Law 97
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Civics. Provides that as part of the United States government credit awarded for the general, Core 40, Core 40 with academic honors, and Core 40 with technical honors designation, each high school shall administer the naturalization examination provided by the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Requires an enhanced study of the Holocaust in each high school United States history course.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civics. Provides that as part of the United States government credit awarded for the general, Core 40, Core 40 with academic honors, and Core 40 with technical honors designation, each high school shall administer the naturalization examination provided by the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Requires an enhanced study of the Holocaust in each high school United States history course.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenatePublic Law 97
2019-04-25SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-11SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-08SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 412: yeas 40, nays 8
2019-04-03SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-04-03HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-04-02HouseRepresentatives Cook, Klinker, DeLaney added as cosponsors
2019-04-02HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2019-04-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 387: yeas 93, nays 3
2019-04-01HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-28HouseRepresentative Abbott D added as cosponsor
2019-03-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-18HouseRepresentative Stutzman added as cosponsor
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2019-01-25SenateReferred to the House
2019-01-24SenateSenator Tomes added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Merritt added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Glick added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Buck added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateCosponsor: Representative Thompson
2019-01-24SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Burton
2019-01-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 23: yeas 31, nays 17
2019-01-22SenateSenator Young M added as coauthor
2019-01-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-17SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-14SenateSenator Spartz added as coauthor
2019-01-14SenateSenator Rogers added as coauthor
2019-01-14SenateSenator Garten added as coauthor
2019-01-14SenateSenator Doriot added as coauthor
2019-01-14SenateSenator Buchanan added as coauthor
2019-01-10SenateSenator Raatz added as coauthor
2019-01-10SenateSenator Leising added as coauthor
2019-01-10SenateSenator Crane added as coauthor
2019-01-08SenateSenator Koch added as third author
2019-01-07SenateSenator Ruckelshaus added as second author
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Kruse

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/132/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/3/6/d136fb71/SB0132.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/1/3/1e134afb/SB0132.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/3/5/1e35783c/SB0132.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/2/e/c22e1a6f/SB0132.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/4/4/8b442062/SB0132.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/5/9/6b59c74a/SB0132.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/4/9/4149c73c/SB0132.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/b/3/2ab34aa6/SB0132.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/e/1/0ce13955/SB0132.23.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/a/6/2/aa62cee3/SB0132.02.COMS.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/e/b/4deb59ce/SB0132.387.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/9/1/28916fb8/SB0132.412.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback