IN SB0131 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Public Law 11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Public Law 11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform electronic legal material act. Implements the Uniform Electronic Legal Material Act, which establishes a process for certain legal materials stored electronically to be: (1) designated as official; (2) authenticated; (3) preserved; and (4) made available to the public.
Title
Uniform electronic legal material act.
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] |
Rep. John Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Public Law 11 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-02-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-02-16 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2022-02-15 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 187: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2022-02-14 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-31 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senator Brown L added as third author |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senator Young M added as second author |
2022-01-20 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Young J |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 28: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Freeman) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Senator Koch added as coauthor |
2022-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Freeman |