IN SB0130 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Renaming cities. Provides that the statute that permits a city to change its name does not apply to a city if the city is named in the Constitution of the State of Indiana or in the Indiana Code. Provides the following with regard to a petition to change the name of a city: (1) Petitioners must file the petition with the county board of registration signed by the number of voters equal to 2% of the votes cast in the last election for secretary of state in the city. (2) If the county board of registration finds that the petition meets the statutory criteria, the county election board shall place the question of the name change on the ballot provided for voters in the city at the first general or municipal election following certification of the public question.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renaming cities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2021-02-03SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-02SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2021-02-02SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Speedy
2021-02-02SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 43: yeas 36, nays 11
2021-02-01SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-25SenateSenator Tomes added as second author
2021-01-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2021-01-05SenateAuthored by Senator Sandlin

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/130/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/2/5/0025b96d/SB0130.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/b/e/a3bea10a/SB0130.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/4/e/b64e3856/SB0130.02.COMS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/c/9/f4c9e92c/SB0130.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/a/6/4ea67f43/SB0130.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/f/9/59f9e8e3/SB0130.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/7/4/9574b430/SB0130.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/5/6/3a56b376/SB0130.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/2/4/f9242c5d/SB0130.01.INTR.05.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/7/2/99728235/SB0130.43_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback