IN SB0130 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Unemployment insurance matters. Includes in the definition of "employment", for the purposes of the unemployment compensation system, service performed by a driver who provides drive away operations, if the driver is employed by a state or local government entity, a federally recognized Indiana tribe, or a nonprofit organization. Excludes from the definition of "employment", for purposes of the unemployment compensation system, service performed by a driver who provides drive away operations when: (1) the vehicle being driven is the commodity being delivered; and (2) the driver has entered into an agreement with the party arranging for the transportation that specifies the driver is an independent contractor and not an employee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unemployment insurance matters. Includes in the definition of "employment", for the purposes of the unemployment compensation system, service performed by a driver who provides drive away operations, if the driver is employed by a state or local government entity, a federally recognized Indiana tribe, or a nonprofit organization. Excludes from the definition of "employment", for purposes of the unemployment compensation system, service performed by a driver who provides drive away operations when: (1) the vehicle being driven is the commodity being delivered; and (2) the driver has entered into an agreement with the party arranging for the transportation that specifies the driver is an independent contractor and not an employee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenatePublic Law 63
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-02HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-02SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-03-29HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2019-03-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 363: yeas 89, nays 0
2019-03-26HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-21HouseRepresentative Wesco added as cosponsor
2019-03-19HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2019-02-01SenateReferred to the House
2019-01-31SenateSenator Niezgodski added as coauthor
2019-01-31SenateCosponsor: Representative Stutzman
2019-01-31SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Miller D
2019-01-31SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 51: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-01-29SenateSenator Spartz added as coauthor
2019-01-29SenateSenator Mishler added as coauthor
2019-01-29SenateAmendment #2 (Doriot) prevailed; voice vote
2019-01-29SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-01-24SenateSenators Kruse and Freeman added as coauthors
2019-01-24SenateSenators Walker and Garten added as coauthors
2019-01-24SenateSenator Messmer added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Rogers added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Glick added as third author
2019-01-24SenateSenator Boots added as second author
2019-01-24SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Doriot

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/130/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/3/b/e23bdea9/SB0130.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/5/e/a/85eaf894/SB0130.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/b/d/afbd1248/SB0130.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/d/3/9ad34441/SB0130.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/b/a/f9ba92f0/SB0130.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/1/6/64168a0f/SB0130.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/1/6/87164fec/SB0130.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/c/7/76c701e1/SB0130.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/f/1/f9f13045/SB0130.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/2/3/a723c15d/SB0130.01.INTR.04.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/e/9/22e9af15/SB0130.51.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/9/f/969f61dc/SB0130.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/2/b/eb2bab22/SB0130.363.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback