IN SB0129 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-02 - First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits dental insurers and health maintenance organizations from requiring dentists to accept certain payments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contracts for dental services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-02 First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
2010-01-28 Senator Steele added as coauthor
2010-01-28 Cosponsor: Rep. Dodge
2010-01-28 House sponsor: Rep. Welch
2010-01-28 Referred to the House
2010-01-28 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 69: Yeas 45 and Nays 3
2010-01-26 Senator Gard added as second author
2010-01-26 Amendment 1 (Leising), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-01-26 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-01-26 Senator Errington added as coauthor
2010-01-21 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2010-01-05 Authored by Senator Leising

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback