IN SB0128 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Sewage and waste management districts. Provides that the county executive of a county in which a regional sewage district was formed in response to an agreed order entered into after August 31, 2005, may elect to transform the regional sewage district into a county onsite waste management district. Establishes a procedure under which the regional sewage district may be transformed into a county onsite waste management district if the county executive decides to make that transformation. Provides that the primary purpose of the county onsite waste management district, if formed, will be resolving the environmental problems described in the agreed
Title
Sewage and waste management districts. Provides that the county executive of a county in which a regional sewage district was formed in response to an agreed order entered into after August 31, 2005, may elect to transform the regional sewage district into a county onsite waste management district. Establishes a procedure under which the regional sewage district may be transformed into a county onsite waste management district if the county executive decides to make that transformation. Provides that the primary purpose of the county onsite waste management district, if formed, will be resolving the environmental problems described in the agreed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environmental Affairs - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environmental Affairs - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Representative Lehman added as sponsor |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 207: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holdman |