IN SB0128 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Includes fire protection districts and fire protection territories as units for purposes of participation in the statewide emergency mutual aid program under certain circumstances. Provides that a county, municipality, township, fire protection district, or fire protection territory that participates in the program and that receives disaster assistance from another participating unit shall reimburse the assisting unit for certain expenses to the extent the expenses are not covered by reimbursements.
Title
Emergency management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 19 | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-03-04 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 289: Yeas 91, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended | |
2010-03-04 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 261: Yeas 48, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-03 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2010-03-01 | House advisors appointed: Barnes, Soliday and Wolkins | |
2010-03-01 | House conferees appointed: Tincher and Ruppel | |
2010-02-25 | Senate advisors appointed: Buck and Errington | |
2010-02-25 | Senate conferees appointed: Wyss and Arnold | |
2010-02-25 | Senate dissented from House amendments | |
2010-02-25 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2010-02-25 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 231: Yeas 77, Nays 20 | |
2010-02-24 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-22 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-15 | Representative Barnes added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-02 | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety | |
2010-01-21 | Cosponsor: Rep. Ruppel | |
2010-01-21 | House sponsor: Rep. Tincher | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to the House | |
2010-01-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 26: Yeas 50 and Nays 0 | |
2010-01-19 | Amendment 1 (Wyss), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-01-19 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-12 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation & Veterans Affairs | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Senators Wyss and Arnold |