IN SB0126 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Government ethics and procurement of certain services. Requires a political subdivision to comply with certain procedures when acquiring the services of architects, engineers, and land surveyors. (Under current law, the procedures are not mandatory.) Requires a public agency awarding a contract for the services of architects, engineers, and land surveyors to publicly post, for each firm that submits a statement of qualifications for a project, the public agency's evaluation of the firm for the project. Provides that a firm may not make a contribution to an individual who holds an elected office of the political subdivision awarding a contract for

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Government ethics and procurement of certain services. Requires a political subdivision to comply with certain procedures when acquiring the services of architects, engineers, and land surveyors. (Under current law, the procedures are not mandatory.) Requires a public agency awarding a contract for the services of architects, engineers, and land surveyors to publicly post, for each firm that submits a statement of qualifications for a project, the public agency's evaluation of the firm for the project. Provides that a firm may not make a contribution to an individual who holds an elected office of the political subdivision awarding a contract for

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-13HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2017-02-28SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-27SenateCosponsors: Representatives Carbaugh and Heine
2017-02-27SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Ober
2017-02-27SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 193: yeas 45, nays 3
2017-02-23SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-02-23SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-21SenateSenator Bohacek added as second author
2017-02-20SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections
2017-01-04SenateAuthored by Senator Brown L

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback