IN SB0126 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Allows one or more rural electric membership corporations (REMCs) to merge or consolidate with one or more rural telephone cooperative corporations to form a surviving corporation (in the case of a merger) or a successor corporation (in the case of a consolidation). Provides that a surviving corporation or successor corporation: (1) is considered to be both an REMC and a telephone cooperative corporation; and (2) has all the rights, powers, privileges, immunities, and exemptions of an REMC and a telephone cooperative corporation. Sets forth provisions concerning the following with respect to a surviving corporation or successor corporation: (1) Articles of incorporation and bylaws. (2) Selection of the board of directors. (3) General and enumerated powers of the board and the surviving corporation or successor corporation. (4) Members and meetings of members. (5) Obligations and liabilities of the surviving corporation or successor corporation. (6) The acquisition and disposition of property. (7) Articles of dissolution. (8) Charges for services rendered. (9) The jurisdiction of the utility regulatory commission (IURC).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Merger of rural electric and telephone cooperatives.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 Effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Public Law 18
2010-03-12 Signed by the Governor
2010-03-09 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-02-25 Signed by the Speaker
2010-02-24 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2010-02-22 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2010-02-22 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 193: Yeas 94, Nays 1
2010-02-18 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-02-15 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-02-02 First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Energy, Technology and Utilities
2010-01-26 Senator Leising added as coauthor
2010-01-26 Cosponsors: Reps. Cherry, Moses and Wolkins
2010-01-26 House sponsor: Rep. Stilwell
2010-01-26 Referred to the House
2010-01-26 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 41: Yeas 50 and Nays 0
2010-01-21 Senator Randolph added as coauthor
2010-01-21 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-19 Senators Stutzman and Lawson added as coauthors
2010-01-19 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-12 Senator R. Young added as coauthor
2010-01-11 Senator Lanane added as coauthor
2010-01-11 Senator Merritt added as second author
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities & Technology
2010-01-05 Authored by Senator Gard

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback