IN SB0125 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Public Law 93
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Public Law 93
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Registration of underground utility excavation contractors. Provides that a contractor that will perform one or more excavations or demolitions in Indiana under a contract with: (1) a communications service provider; or (2) a utility; must include in an entity filing filed with the secretary of state a statement that the contractor and its employees will comply with Indiana's 811 statute. Provides that a contractor that is a filing entity under the Uniform Business Organizations Code (Code) shall provide documentation of the contractor's compliance with the registration requirement to a communications service provider or a utility before entering into a contract
Title
Registration of underground utility excavation contractors. Provides that a contractor that will perform one or more excavations or demolitions in Indiana under a contract with: (1) a communications service provider; or (2) a utility; must include in an entity filing filed with the secretary of state a statement that the contractor and its employees will comply with Indiana's 811 statute. Provides that a contractor that is a filing entity under the Uniform Business Organizations Code (Code) shall provide documentation of the contractor's compliance with the registration requirement to a communications service provider or a utility before entering into a contract
Sponsors
Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Michael Delph [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. David Ober [R] | Rep. Todd Huston [R] | Rep. Ryan Hatfield [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public Law 93 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-06 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2018-03-05 | House | Representative Hatfield added as cosponsor |
2018-03-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 304: yeas 92, nays 1 |
2018-02-28 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-26 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Huston |
2018-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Ober |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 162: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senator Delph added as third author |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as second author |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Merritt |