IN SB0124 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Representative Pressel added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Representative Pressel added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle operation. Provides that an individual subject to both an administrative license suspension and a court ordered license suspension must file a petition for specialized driving privileges in the court that ordered the suspension. Repeals a statute requiring the use of a turn signal 200 feet before making a turn.
Title
Motor vehicle operation.
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Rep. John Young [R] |
Rep. Jim Pressel [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Representative Pressel added as cosponsor |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-31 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as third author |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as second author |
2022-01-18 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Young J |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 17: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Freeman |