IN SB0123 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Public Law 126
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Public Law 126
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dyslexia screening and intervention. Provides that the dyslexia screening and intervention provisions apply to: (1) qualified districts or qualified high schools; and (2) innovation network schools. Provides that the following may not waive or suspend the dyslexia screening and intervention provisions: (1) A coalition of continuous improvement school districts. (2) State accredited public schools. Adds, for consistency, the dyslexia screening and intervention provisions to the list of statutes that apply to charter schools. (Under current law, the dyslexia screening and intervention requirements already apply to charter schools because of the language in the dyslexia screening and intervention provisions.)
Title
Dyslexia screening and intervention.
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. John Crane [R] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. Kyle Walker [R] |
Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Fady Qaddoura [D] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. Clyde Perfect [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] |
Rep. Mike Speedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Public Law 126 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 345: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2022-03-07 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 354: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2022-03-07 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Crane and Yoder |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Freeman and Qaddoura |
2022-02-28 | House | House advisors appointed: Jordan, Davis and Klinker |
2022-02-28 | House | House conferees appointed: Speedy and Pfaff |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2022-02-23 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2022-02-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 232: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2022-02-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as third author |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senator Crane added as second author |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senator Crane removed as coauthor |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senator Houchin removed as second author |
2022-01-31 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Perfect added as coauthor |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senators Kruse, Alting, Becker, Crane added as coauthors |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor |
2022-01-25 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Speedy |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 70: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senators Walker K, Rogers, Qaddoura added as coauthors |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as second author |
2022-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Freeman |