IN SB0123 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 04/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 04/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county treasurer to send via a nationally recognized express parcel carrier any document that the county treasurer may send via the United States mail under the property tax billing statute or the property tax provisional billing statute.
Title
Use of private services for tax bill delivery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Effective 04/26/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Public Law 61 | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-04-19 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-18 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-14 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-12 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | |
2011-04-12 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 480: yeas 87, nays 5 | |
2011-04-11 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-08 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-02-03 | Senator Lawson added as second author | |
2011-02-03 | Cosponsor: Rep. Heuer | |
2011-02-03 | House sponsor: Rep. Neese | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to the House | |
2011-02-03 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 65: yeas 46 and nays 2 | |
2011-01-31 | Senator R. Young added as coauthor | |
2011-01-31 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-27 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Senator Kruse |