IN SB0122 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Public Law 10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Drug schedules. Adds new scheduled drugs to the statutory drug schedules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drug schedules.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01SenatePublic Law 10
2021-04-01SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-03-31SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-03-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-03-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-03-17HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2021-03-16HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 267: yeas 97, nays 1
2021-03-15HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-11HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-02-23HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2021-01-27SenateReferred to the House
2021-01-26SenateCosponsor: Representative Steuerwald
2021-01-26SenateHouse sponsor: Representative McNamara
2021-01-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 22: yeas 48, nays 0
2021-01-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-12SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2021-01-05SenateAuthored by Senator Young M

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/122/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/1/2/1/3121b9e8/SB0122.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/d/d/a4dd709d/SB0122.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/d/5/02d5aab2/SB0122.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/1/a/3a1a6aa1/SB0122.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/f/c/86fc955a/SB0122.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/7/b/4f7b87c1/SB0122.04.ENRH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/0/f/150ff2e3/SB0122.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/f/a/0ffa3450/SB0122.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/6/c/e46ca601/SB0122.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/e/c/83eca12c/SB0122.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/2/e/f52ece3f/SB0122.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/7/2/9c72f2d4/SB0122.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/5/c/5e5ca8cb/SB0122.02.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/4/9/78497d3e/SB0122.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/b/6/eeb6add4/SB0122.03.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/8/0/d180c219/SB0122.03.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/e/3/60e3b1c7/SB0122.04.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/0/f/680f886b/SB0122.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/c/8/c5c8290b/SB0122.22_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/6/0/34604dfe/SB0122.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/9/8/2e98ae34/SB0122.267_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback