IN SB0120 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - Second reading: ordered engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Distribution of revenue for public safety purposes. Provides that, subject to the approval of a county adopting body, a fire protection district or a qualified fire protection territory may apply for distributions of tax revenue. Provides that a township that provides fire protection or emergency medical services (other than a township in Marion County) may apply to a county adopting body for a distribution of tax revenue for public safety purposes. Requires the adopting body to conduct a public hearing to review and approve the application. Specifies the method for determining the amount of the distribution to the qualified township.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Distribution of revenue for public safety purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-13SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2022-01-12SenateSenator Charbonneau added as second author
2022-01-11SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2022-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2022-01-04SenateAuthored by Senator Niemeyer

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback