IN SB0119 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Public Law 183
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Machine guns. Defines "machine gun". Provides that a person may not sell, give, or in any other manner transfer ownership or possession of a machine gun to any person under 18 years of age. Provides that a person who knowingly or intentionally sells, provides, or in any other manner transfers ownership or possession of a machine gun to a person under 18 years of age commits a: (1) Level 5 felony; (2) Level 4 felony if the person has a prior conviction for the offense; or (3) Level 3 felony if a person under 18 years of age uses the machine gun to commit murder. Makes conforming amendments and a technical correction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Machine guns. Defines "machine gun". Provides that a person may not sell, give, or in any other manner transfer ownership or possession of a machine gun to any person under 18 years of age. Provides that a person who knowingly or intentionally sells, provides, or in any other manner transfers ownership or possession of a machine gun to a person under 18 years of age commits a: (1) Level 5 felony; (2) Level 4 felony if the person has a prior conviction for the offense; or (3) Level 3 felony if a person under 18 years of age uses the machine gun to commit murder. Makes conforming amendments and a technical correction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 75 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House - Amendment #5 (Boy) failed (Y: 31 N: 63 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-01 - House - House - Amendment #4 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 30 N: 64 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - (Y: 64 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Amendment #2 (Taylor G) failed (Y: 13 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenatePublic Law 183
2019-05-02SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-22SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 550: yeas 45, nays 3
2019-04-22HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 578: yeas 72, nays 0
2019-04-18HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-18SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-04HouseHouse advisors appointed: Smaltz, Torr, Hamilton and Hatcher
2019-04-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: Lucas and DeLaney
2019-04-02SenateSenate advisors appointed: Sandlin, Taylor G and Doriot
2019-04-02SenateSenate conferees appointed: Tomes and Randolph Lonnie M
2019-04-02SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2019-04-02SenateMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-02HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-04-02HouseRepresentative Stutzman added as cosponsor
2019-04-02HouseRepresentative Smaltz added as cosponsor
2019-04-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 386: yeas 75, nays 21
2019-04-01HouseAmendment #5 (Boy) failed; Roll Call 378: yeas 31, nays 63
2019-04-01HouseAmendment #2 (Pfaff) ruled out of order
2019-04-01HouseAmendment #4 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 376: yeas 30, nays 64
2019-04-01HouseAmendment #3 (DeLaney) motion withdrawn
2019-04-01HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-28HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2019-03-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2019-02-06SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-05SenateSenator Spartz added as coauthor
2019-02-05SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2019-02-05SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Lucas
2019-02-05SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 77: yeas 48, nays 1
2019-02-04SenateSenator Crane added as coauthor
2019-02-04SenateAmendment #2 (Taylor G) failed; Roll Call 56: yeas 13, nays 36
2019-02-04SenateAmendment #1 (Taylor G) failed; voice vote
2019-02-04SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-31SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-01-31SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-14SenateSenators Garten and Freeman added as coauthors
2019-01-10SenateSenator Doriot added as third author
2019-01-10SenateSenator Sandlin added as second author
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Tomes

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/119/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/3/5/063504c1/SB0119.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/c/9/c8c9eec6/SB0119.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/c/b/03cb6cd8/SB0119.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/b/e/acbe5766/SB0119.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/4/6/88460a90/SB0119.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/6/0/cc60d219/SB0119.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/e/a/57ea29aa/SB0119.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/b/9/51b9e212/SB0119.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/7/c/807c8fcd/SB0119.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/f/6/46f6c7e5/SB0119.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/d/0/59d04fcb/SB0119.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/8/d/f18db3f3/SB0119.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/0/1/04010c0f/SB0119.56.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/e/1/86e10d3b/SB0119.77.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/7/d/077dda6e/SB0119.03.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/a/e/e1ae18ba/SB0119.04.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/8/6/1b86b9d3/SB0119.377.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/7/0/d370806a/SB0119.376.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/f/1/f3f1bf67/SB0119.378.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/f/6/7ff63099/SB0119.386.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/4/7/c547eec4/SB0119.550.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/c/c/30cceb6e/SB0119.578.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback