IN SB0118 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
County council and commissioner salaries. Allows the president of the county executive and the president of the county fiscal body in a county other than Marion County to receive a salary that is more than that of the other members as compensation for extra services performed as president. Provides that a president may not receive additional compensation that exceeds 25% of the salaries of the body's other members. Legalizes and validates any action taken by the bodies or members of the bodies before July 1, 2019, regarding the fixing or receipt of a president's salary that includes compensation for extra services.
Title
County council and commissioner salaries. Allows the president of the county executive and the president of the county fiscal body in a county other than Marion County to receive a salary that is more than that of the other members as compensation for extra services performed as president. Provides that a president may not receive additional compensation that exceeds 25% of the salaries of the body's other members. Legalizes and validates any action taken by the bodies or members of the bodies before July 1, 2019, regarding the fixing or receipt of a president's salary that includes compensation for extra services.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Rep. Dennis Zent [R] |
Rep. Jim Pressel [R] | Rep. Pat Boy [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Pressel and Boy |
2019-02-19 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Zent |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 150: yeas 38, nays 2 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as second author |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor |
2019-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bohacek |