IN SB0117 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

United States history courses. Requires that each high school United States history course must include the study of the structure of state and federal governments. Moves existing language concerning the study of the Holocaust. Requires that all students enrolled in a high school United States history course must take the United States Civics Test prepared by the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Allows school corporations to determine whether a passing score on the test is required to receive credit for the course.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

United States history courses. Requires that each high school United States history course must include the study of the structure of state and federal governments. Moves existing language concerning the study of the Holocaust. Requires that all students enrolled in a high school United States history course must take the United States Civics Test prepared by the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Allows school corporations to determine whether a passing score on the test is required to receive credit for the course.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-28HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2017-02-03SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-02SenateSenator Smith J added as coauthor
2017-02-02SenateCosponsors: Representatives Behning and Smith, V.
2017-02-02SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Cook
2017-02-02SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 53: yeas 39, nays 6
2017-01-31SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-01-30SenateSenator Crane added as coauthor
2017-01-30SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-01-26SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2017-01-17SenateSenator Raatz added as second author
2017-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2017-01-04SenateAuthored by Senator Kruse

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback